U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20715
  • Case Name: Joy Leanora Brannan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
March, 2019
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.