U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20725
  • Case Name: Leonard D. Besel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transfer of Claim]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • August 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Forbearance]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Forbearance]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Quash]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transfer of Claim]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Quash]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Response]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discovery Report]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proof Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1)(d)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Objection to]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.