U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20733
  • Case Name: Phillip Andrew Wolf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
November, 2019
  • November 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Response]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Response]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Quash]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compel]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Alias Summons Issued]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Document]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Complaint]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • June 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compel]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Brief]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compel]
February, 2019
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Examination]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
  • January 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reply]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Examination]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Brief]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.