U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20750
  • Case Name: Herbert Moniz Souza and Theresa Ann Souza
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Proposed Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auctioneers Statement of Property Sold]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
April, 2019
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compel]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Vacating Order]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Brief]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Debtors Claim of Exemptions]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Intent]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Generic Motion]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.