U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Oliver v. Octagroup Technologies LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Opposition]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 13, 2018: [Quash]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Default Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 12, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • October 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.