U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00149
  • Case Name: First Interstate Bank v. Patel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Mail Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 16, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • October 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 13, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 13, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.