U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20753
  • Case Name: Rex E Martin and Dava Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • February 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
  • February 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim(s)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Withdrawal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Claim]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Addendum]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.