U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02032
  • Case Name: E-Z Cash, Inc. v. Reynolds et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [D Misc BAP Order]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appellee Designation]
  • December 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • December 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appellant Designation]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • November 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Strike]
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Decision and Order]
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • October 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • October 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • October 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Strike]
  • October 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • October 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • October 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • September 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • September 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
  • June 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Strike]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • June 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Strike]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • May 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • May 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [To Amend Order]
  • May 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to]
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.