U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Arndt et al v. Archive Finishing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 14, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 05, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 02, 2018: [Payment Entry]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 01, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 11, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.