U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Ashcraft v. Walmart Stores Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 25, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 03, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 24, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • September 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 18, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • September 06, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • August 05, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 02, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 02, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 23, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 08, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 29, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • October 29, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.