U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Tewary v. Sinclair Oil Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 14, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 07, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 27, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2018: [Recusal]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • September 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.