U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20765
  • Case Name: Dezeree Janette Munoz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
December, 2019
  • December 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Directive]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule J]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule I]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule H]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Schedule G]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.