U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02033
  • Case Name: Katzl v. United States Department of Education
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding]
  • November 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Status Report]
  • November 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • July 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Compel]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • April 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • April 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
February, 2019
  • February 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • December 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • November 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 29, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.