U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20766
  • Case Name: Jon Kurt Slovernick and Barbara Lou Slovernick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transfer of Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Transfer of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Social Security Number]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stewart, Mark R. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.