U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Kirkwood v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 03, 2019: [Letter(s)]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 18, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 17, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 17, 2018: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Letter(s)]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 04, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • September 24, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.