U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Lambert et al v. Habila et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 30, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 01, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Jury Demand]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 19, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.