U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Berenergy Corporation v. Bureau of Land Management
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 16, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 05, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Brief]
  • September 04, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • June 19, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 19, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 11, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 11, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 10, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [In Court Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 06, 2019: [Response]
  • March 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 04, 2019: [Brief]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 18, 2018: [Vacate]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • October 16, 2018: [Intervene]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 09, 2018: [Vacate]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Brief]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 27, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 27, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 27, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • September 27, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.