U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Lexington Insurance Company et al v. Bamburg
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Mail Returned]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • July 29, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • July 22, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 28, 2019: [Entry of Default]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 06, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • February 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.