U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20783
  • Case Name: Mary Candice Boltz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.