U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Peterssen v. Haidari et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • September 22, 2020: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • September 21, 2020: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • September 21, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2020: [Vacate]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • June 15, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Vacate]
  • June 10, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [In Limine]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 22, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 03, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 21, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • February 11, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 01, 2019: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 28, 2019: [Intervene]
  • January 18, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 19, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.