U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Interim Healthcare of Wyoming Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 29, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • December 26, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • December 26, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 09, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 28, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 28, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.