U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02034
  • Case Name: David Norris and Lisa Norris v. Besel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding]
  • May 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion ]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • April 01, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Adversary Proceedings]
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend Order]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [To Amend Order]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [To Amend Order]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
October, 2018
  • October 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.