U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Advantage Trim & Lumber of Florida Inc v. Ipe Woods USA LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 05, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Witness List]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • January 29, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • January 23, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 26, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • December 18, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 18, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • December 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • December 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 06, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 09, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2018: [Opposition]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 01, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 01, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 26, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 03, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • October 03, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.