U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20789
  • Case Name: Diane Michelle Simurdak
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustees Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismiss Case - Trustee]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Exhibit]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Witness List]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule A/B]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • November 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule E/F]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule J]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule I]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule H]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule G]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule D]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule C]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Schedule A/B]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Social Security Number]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Take Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.