U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Wells v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • March 04, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • February 19, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 29, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 29, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • November 14, 2018: [Letter(s)]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • October 04, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.