U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Bloomfield v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Honor Farm Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [10th Circuit Filing]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 10, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Remark]
  • November 13, 2018: [Objection]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • October 04, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 04, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.