U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20790
  • Case Name: Integrity Medical Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
December, 2019
  • December 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Withdrawal of Objection to Claim]
September, 2019
  • September 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Objection to Claim(s)]
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Scheduling Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Response]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employ]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Objection to Claim]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Employ]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order (Generic)]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Proposed Order]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Response]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Order (Generic)]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Notice]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zubrod, Tracy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.