U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20791
  • Case Name: Janet Mary Hanley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Completion of Plan Pymts]
  • January 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Discharge]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Waive Credit Counseling]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Waive Credit Counseling]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Affidavit]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Compliance with Plan Payments]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Default of Plan Payment]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.