U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Total Home Exteriors Inc v. James
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Reply Brief]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Brief]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Appendix]
  • November 21, 2018: [Brief]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record]
  • October 24, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • October 24, 2018: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • October 22, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • October 05, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.