U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20797
  • Case Name: Robin Annette Layton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2019
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.