U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Noggle et al v. Basin Electric Power Cooperative
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 25, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Status Report]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 13, 2019: [Certify Class]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 14, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 11, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 30, 2018: [Withdrawal of Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.