U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20804
  • Case Name: William Hornbrook Wotkyns
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Administrative Expenses]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
September, 2021
  • September 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Administrative Expenses]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2021
  • April 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Affidavit]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Vacate]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Objection]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice Pursuant to LBR 2002-1]
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Subpoena Issued]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Examination]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employ]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.