U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00170
  • Case Name: TeamLINX LLLP v. Casper Electric Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2020: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 20, 2020: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Bench Trial]
  • February 19, 2020: [Deposition]
  • February 19, 2020: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 07, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 06, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 11, 2019: [Appendix]
  • November 11, 2019: [Brief]
  • November 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 29, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 29, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Witness List]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Reply]
  • November 19, 2018: [Opposition]
  • November 05, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 11, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.