U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20818
  • Case Name: Tara Gene Hill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2019
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Intent]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule H]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule C]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule A/B]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule D]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.