U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00171
  • Case Name: Leonard v. Lincoln County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 07, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 07, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 04, 2019: [Objection]
  • February 04, 2019: [Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Response]
  • January 23, 2019: [Response]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stay Discovery]
  • January 17, 2019: [Response]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Reply]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2019: [Compel]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 28, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • November 29, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 28, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 19, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • October 19, 2018: [Compel]
  • October 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.