U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20819
  • Case Name: Leanne Poulsen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.