U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20821
  • Case Name: Kaye Nielsen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.