U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20822
  • Case Name: Frederick James Konruff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.