U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20829
  • Case Name: Lindzy Kristina Leicester
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule E/F]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Schedule D]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.