U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20826
  • Case Name: James Ronald Davis and Charity Lee Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • January 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Claim(s)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.