U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20825
  • Case Name: Louis Dane Shaw and Rachael Marie Shaw
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Schedule E/F]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.