U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Richard Kaumo et al v. Sweetwater County School District No 1 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.