U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Tibben v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 18, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • December 02, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • September 06, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 14, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 11, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 17, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • March 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2019: [Counterclaim]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • October 23, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.