U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20834
  • Case Name: Heath B. Fullmer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Transmittal of Small Dividends]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
July, 2019
  • July 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Withdrawal of Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.