U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20839
  • Case Name: Baker Hydro-Excavating, Inc
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
March, 2020
  • March 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Addendum]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • December 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice ]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Order]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Modify Plan]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
September, 2019
  • September 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Addendum]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement for Small Business]
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 11 Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Addendum]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • June 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Small Business Plan]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Decision and Order]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Ch11 Monthly Financial Report]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • January 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • January 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Abandon]
  • December 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • November 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • November 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings (Order)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expediting Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Abandon]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules/Petition]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Hearing]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Corp/Ptnr Resolution]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.