U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20844
  • Case Name: Katie Lynn McCoin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
August, 2019
  • August 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
March, 2019
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.