U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20851
  • Case Name: Jonathan Patrick Alisna
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
June, 2019
  • June 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.