U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02035
  • Case Name: Royal v. Ally Financial
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • December 09, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 20, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Discovery Report]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • December 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Payment]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Defer Fee]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.