U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20856
  • Case Name: Stephen Patrick O'Donnell, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.