U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Cunningham v. Air Voice Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 19, 2019: [Default Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Hearing - Dispositive]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.